Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB1908 Compare Versions

The same version is selected twice. Please select two different versions to compare.
OldNewDifferences
11 By: Eiland, Hilderbran (Senate Sponsor - Hancock) H.B. No. 1908
22 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2013;
33 May 9, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Economic
44 Development; May 17, 2013, reported favorably by the following
55 vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 17, 2013, sent to printer.)
66
77
88 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
99 AN ACT
1010 relating to sports and community venue projects.
1111 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1212 SECTION 1. Section 334.001(4), Local Government Code, is
1313 amended to read as follows:
1414 (4) "Venue" means:
1515 (A) an arena, coliseum, stadium, or other type of
1616 area or facility:
1717 (i) that is used or is planned for use for
1818 one or more professional or amateur sports events, community
1919 events, or other sports events, including rodeos, livestock shows,
2020 agricultural expositions, promotional events, and other civic or
2121 charitable events; and
2222 (ii) for which a fee for admission to the
2323 events is charged or is planned to be charged;
2424 (B) a convention center, convention center
2525 facility as defined by Section 351.001(2) or 352.001(2), Tax Code,
2626 or related improvement such as a [convention center, civic center,
2727 civic center building,] civic center hotel, [auditorium,] theater,
2828 opera house, music hall, [exhibition hall,] rehearsal hall, park,
2929 zoological park, museum, aquarium, or plaza located in the vicinity
3030 of a convention center or facility owned by a municipality or a
3131 county;
3232 (C) a tourist development area along an inland
3333 waterway;
3434 (D) a municipal parks and recreation system, or
3535 improvements or additions to a parks and recreation system, or an
3636 area or facility that is part of a municipal parks and recreation
3737 system;
3838 (E) a project authorized by Section 4A or 4B,
3939 Development Corporation Act of 1979 (Article 5190.6, Vernon's Texas
4040 Civil Statutes), as that Act existed on September 1, 1997; and
4141 (F) a watershed protection and preservation
4242 project; a recharge, recharge area, or recharge feature protection
4343 project; a conservation easement; or an open-space preservation
4444 program intended to protect water.
4545 SECTION 2. Section 334.024, Local Government Code, is
4646 amended by adding Subsection (d-1) to read as follows:
4747 (d-1) If the proposition is authorizing the imposition of a
4848 hotel occupancy tax under Subchapter H, the ballot must include the
4949 following language: "If approved, the maximum hotel occupancy tax
5050 rate imposed from all sources in ______ (insert name of
5151 municipality or county) would be ______ (insert the maximum
5252 combined hotel occupancy tax rate that would be imposed from all
5353 sources at any location in the municipality or county, as
5454 applicable, if the rate proposed in the ballot proposition is
5555 adopted) of the price paid for a room in a hotel."
5656 SECTION 3. Section 334.254, Local Government Code, is
5757 amended to read as follows:
5858 Sec. 334.254. TAX RATE. (a) Except as provided by
5959 Subsections [Subsection] (c) and (d), the tax authorized by this
6060 subchapter may be imposed by a municipality or county at any rate
6161 not to exceed two percent of the price paid for a room in a hotel.
6262 (b) The ballot proposition at the election held to adopt the
6363 tax must specify:
6464 (1) the maximum rate of the tax to be adopted; and
6565 (2) the maximum combined hotel occupancy tax rate that
6666 would be imposed from all sources at any location in the
6767 municipality or county, as applicable, if the rate proposed in the
6868 ballot proposition is adopted.
6969 (c) Except as provided by Subsection (d), a [A] county with
7070 a population of more than two million that is adjacent to a county
7171 with a population of more than one million may impose the tax
7272 authorized by this subchapter at any rate not to exceed three
7373 percent of the price paid for a room in a hotel.
7474 (d) A municipality or county may not propose a hotel
7575 occupancy tax rate that would cause the combined hotel occupancy
7676 tax rate imposed from all sources at any location in the
7777 municipality or county, as applicable, to exceed 17 percent of the
7878 price paid for a room in a hotel. The following are not included in
7979 calculating the combined tax rate under this subsection:
8080 (1) an assessment for an improvement project described
8181 by Section 372.0035;
8282 (2) an assessment authorized by Chapter 375; or
8383 (3) a fee collected by a hotel to recover the cost of
8484 an assessment described by Subdivision (1) or (2).
8585 SECTION 4. Section 334.255(b), Local Government Code, is
8686 amended to read as follows:
8787 (b) The ballot for an election to increase the rate of the
8888 tax shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
8989 proposition: "The increase of the hotel occupancy tax for the
9090 purpose of financing __________ (insert description of venue
9191 project) to a maximum rate of ___________ percent (insert new
9292 maximum applicable rate). If approved, the maximum hotel occupancy
9393 tax rate imposed from all sources in ______ (insert name of
9494 municipality or county) would be _________ (insert the maximum
9595 combined hotel occupancy tax rate that would be imposed from all
9696 sources at any location in the municipality or county, as
9797 applicable, if the rate proposed in the ballot proposition is
9898 adopted) of the price paid for a room in a hotel."
9999 SECTION 5. Section 335.054, Local Government Code, is
100100 amended by adding Subsection (d-1) to read as follows:
101101 (d-1) If the proposition is authorizing the imposition of a
102102 hotel occupancy tax, the ballot must include the following
103103 language: "If approved, the maximum hotel occupancy tax rate
104104 imposed from all sources in _____ (insert name of district) would be
105105 ______ (insert the maximum combined hotel occupancy tax rate that
106106 would be imposed from all sources at any location in the district if
107107 the rate proposed in the ballot proposition is adopted) of the price
108108 paid for a room in a hotel."
109109 SECTION 6. (a) The change in law made by this Act to Section
110110 334.001, Local Government Code, applies only to a venue project
111111 authorized on or after the effective date of this Act. A venue
112112 project authorized before the effective date of this Act is
113113 governed by the law in effect when the venue project was authorized,
114114 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
115115 (b) The changes in law made by this Act to Sections 334.024,
116116 334.254(b), 334.255, and 335.054, Local Government Code, apply only
117117 to an election held on or after the effective date of this Act. An
118118 election held before the effective date of this Act is governed by
119119 the law in effect when the election was held, and the former law is
120120 continued in effect for that purpose.
121121 (c) Section 334.254(d), Local Government Code, as added by
122122 this Act, does not apply to a hotel occupancy tax proposed and
123123 authorized by an election held before the effective date of this
124124 Act. A hotel occupancy tax proposed and authorized by an election
125125 held before the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in
126126 effect when the election was held, and the former law is continued
127127 in effect for that purpose.
128128 SECTION 7. This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
129129 * * * * *