E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Filed without the Governor's signature
|
|
Journal Page: 5443
|
E
|
05/27/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5440
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3861
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5434
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5439
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5389
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3784
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3784
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3762
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5001
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4991
|
House
|
05/25/2013
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3590
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4877
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4877
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3281
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 3281
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3279
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3279
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3279
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4850
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4850
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 4850
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4553
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2886
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2886
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2886
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2885
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2885
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Van de Putte
|
Journal Page: 2885
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2885
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2885
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2884
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2884
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Motion withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 2847
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Motion to suspend regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2847
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2256
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2257
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1671
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1572
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1572
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1441
|
House
|
05/05/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2551
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2378
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#512
|
Journal Page: 2377
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2377
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2375
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2374
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2322
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#500
|
Journal Page: 2321
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2321
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2321
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
7-Herrero
|
Journal Page: 2320
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Motion to table fails
|
7-Herrero
|
Journal Page: 2320
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
7-Herrero
|
Journal Page: 2319
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Amendment tabled
|
6-Dale
|
Journal Page: 2318
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Amended
|
5-Patrick
|
Journal Page: 2318
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
2-Dale
|
Journal Page: 2316
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2315
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2028
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2013
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 606
|
House
|
03/05/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 606
|
House
|
02/27/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|