E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective on 9/1/13
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5442
|
E
|
05/20/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4076
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2155
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2056
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3691
|
House
|
05/18/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3911
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3659
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3660
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#930
|
Journal Page: 3659
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3659
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3240
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1772
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1772
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1772
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1772
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1772
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1772
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1772
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Hegar
|
Journal Page: 1772
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1772
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1772
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1673
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 1328
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1328
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1267
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2028
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1925
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#345
|
Journal Page: 1925
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1925
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1924
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1889
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1889
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1889
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1678
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2013
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 610
|
House
|
03/05/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 610
|
House
|
02/27/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|