E
|
05/16/2013
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/16/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3674
|
E
|
05/06/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2722
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1406
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2198
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2366
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2160
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Remarks ordered printed
|
|
Journal Page: 1366
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1366
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1365
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1365
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1365
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1365
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1365
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1365
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1365
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1258
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 971
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 971
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 889
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1544
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#200
|
Journal Page: 1519
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1519
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1519
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1504
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1504
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1190
|
House
|
03/25/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2013
|
Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 479
|
House
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 479
|
House
|
02/18/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|