E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective on 1/1/14
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5442
|
E
|
05/20/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4076
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2155
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3691
|
House
|
05/18/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3911
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3670
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2032
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1938
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1938
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1938
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1937
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1937
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1937
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1937
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1907
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1781
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Referred to Economic Development
|
|
Journal Page: 1572
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1572
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1441
|
House
|
05/05/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2551
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2391
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#526
|
Journal Page: 2390
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2390
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2390
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2346
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2346
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2027
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2013
|
Referred to Economic & Small Business Development
|
|
Journal Page: 613
|
House
|
03/05/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 613
|
House
|
02/28/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|