Senate | 05/17/2013 | No action taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/16/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/16/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/16/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/16/2013 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1902 | |
Senate | 05/10/2013 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 1724 | |
Senate | 05/10/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1724 | |
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1688 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3019 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Record vote | RV#669 | Journal Page: 2765 |
House | 05/08/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2765 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2765 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2747 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2747 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/04/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/03/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2465 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/25/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/25/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/25/2013 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/05/2013 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 614 | |
House | 03/05/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 614 | |
House | 02/28/2013 | Filed |