Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2025 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Capriglione, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Hancock) H.B. No. 2025
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2013;
 May 8, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Jurisprudence; May 16, 2013, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 16, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the concurrent jurisdiction of the municipal courts of
 certain neighboring municipalities to hear criminal cases.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Notwithstanding Section 3, Chapter 76, Acts of
 the 82nd Legislature, Regular Session, 2011 (H.B. 984), relating to
 agreements between neighboring municipalities regarding
 jurisdiction of cases in municipal courts, the change in law made by
 that Act in adding Section 29.003(i), Government Code, and Article
 4.14(g), Code of Criminal Procedure, applies to an offense
 committed or conduct that occurs before, on, or after May 19, 2011,
 which is the effective date of that Act.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *