E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5442
|
E
|
05/27/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5440
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3778
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4871
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4914
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3057
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4522
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4522
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#1183
|
Journal Page: 4522
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4522
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2878
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4160
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2590
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2590
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2590
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2590
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2590
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2590
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2589
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2257
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1724
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1724
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1688
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3091
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2765
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#669
|
Journal Page: 2765
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2765
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2765
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2747
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2747
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2277
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1772
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1773
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Correction in referral
|
|
Journal Page: 1773
|
House
|
03/19/2013
|
Referred to Government Efficiency & Reform
|
|
Journal Page: 811
|
House
|
03/19/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 811
|
House
|
03/07/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|