Senate | 05/07/2013 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 1570 | |
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1570 | |
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1436 | |
House | 05/03/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2465 | |
House | 05/03/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2290 | |
House | 05/03/2013 | Record vote | RV#482 | Journal Page: 2289 |
House | 05/03/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2289 | |
House | 05/03/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2289 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2254 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Amendment fails of adoption | 1-Menndez | Journal Page: 2251 |
House | 05/02/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2251 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/26/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/25/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1982 | |
House | 04/19/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/19/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/19/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/11/2013 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 295 | |
House | 02/11/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 295 | |
House | 11/19/2012 | Filed |