Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2034
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1902
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Referred to Economic Development
|
|
Journal Page: 1863
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1863
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1714
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3091
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2899
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#735
|
Journal Page: 2898
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2898
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2898
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2811
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2811
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Amended
|
2-Anchia, Martinez Fischer, and Murphy
|
Journal Page: 2811
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2810
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1832
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2013
|
Referred to Economic & Small Business Development
|
|
Journal Page: 617
|
House
|
03/05/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 617
|
House
|
02/28/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|