Senate | 05/07/2013 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 1572 | |
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1572 | |
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1496 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2722 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2478 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Record vote | RV#553 | Journal Page: 2477 |
House | 05/06/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2477 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2477 | |
House | 05/04/2013 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2412 | |
House | 05/04/2013 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2412 | |
House | 05/04/2013 | Amended | 2-E. Rodriguez | Journal Page: 2412 |
House | 05/04/2013 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2412 | |
House | 05/03/2013 | Postponed | 5/4/13 8:00 AM | Journal Page: 2357 |
House | 05/03/2013 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2357 | |
House | 05/03/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2314 | |
House | 05/03/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1775 | |
House | 04/09/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/09/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/05/2013 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 617 | |
House | 03/05/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 617 | |
House | 02/28/2013 | Filed |