House | 04/24/2013 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 1821 | |
House | 04/24/2013 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 500 | Journal Page: 1821 |
House | 04/24/2013 | Postponed | Journal Page: 1819 | |
House | 04/24/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1818 | |
House | 04/24/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Transferred to Calendars Committee | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/09/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1472 | |
House | 04/03/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/20/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/20/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/20/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/20/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/05/2013 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 618 | |
House | 03/05/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 618 | |
House | 02/28/2013 | Filed |