83R7893 BEF-F By: Laubenberg H.B. No. 2109 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the physician assistant board. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 204.052(a), Occupations Code, is amended to read as follows: (a) The physician assistant board consists of 13 [nine] members appointed by the governor with the advice and consent of the senate as follows: (1) seven [three] practicing physician assistant members who each have at least five years of clinical experience as a physician assistant; (2) three physician members who are licensed in this state and who supervise physician assistants; and (3) three public members who are not licensed as a physician or physician assistant. SECTION 2. Section 204.054(a), Occupations Code, is amended to read as follows: (a) Members of the physician assistant board are appointed for staggered six-year terms. The terms of four or five [three] members, as applicable, expire on February 1 of each odd-numbered year. SECTION 3. Section 204.055, Occupations Code, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 204.055. OFFICERS. The governor shall designate a physician assistant member of the physician assistant board as the presiding officer of the board to serve in that capacity at the will of the governor. The physician assistant board shall select from its membership a secretary to serve a one-year term. SECTION 4. Not later than November 1, 2013, the governor shall appoint four members to the physician assistant board as provided by Section 204.052(a)(1), Occupations Code, as amended by this Act, as follows: (1) one member for a term expiring February 1, 2015; (2) one member for a term expiring February 1, 2017; and (3) two members for terms expiring February 1, 2019. SECTION 5. If, on the effective date of this Act, the presiding officer of the physician assistant board does not meet the qualifications for office as presiding officer under Section 204.055, Occupations Code, as amended by this Act, the presiding officer is removed from office as presiding officer on that date. As soon as practicable on or after the effective date of this Act, the governor shall appoint a presiding officer who meets the qualifications under Section 204.055, Occupations Code, as amended by this Act. SECTION 6. This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.