House | 05/04/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/03/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2464 | |
House | 04/30/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/20/2013 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 920 | |
House | 03/20/2013 | Correction in referral | Journal Page: 920 | |
House | 03/12/2013 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 707 | |
House | 03/12/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 707 | |
House | 03/01/2013 | Filed |