House
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4876
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4876
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3253
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 3252
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3070
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3070
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3070
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4513
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4513
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 4513
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4158
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2575
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2575
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2575
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2575
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2575
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2575
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2575
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2257
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2031
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1935
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Reported from s/c favorably with substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Testimony taken in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1703
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 1570
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1570
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1436
|
House
|
05/05/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2551
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2408
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#542
|
Journal Page: 2407
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2407
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2407
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2359
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Amended
|
1-Hilderbran
|
Journal Page: 2358
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2358
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Postponed
|
|
Journal Page: 2310
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2310
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1832
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2013
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 283
|
House
|
02/07/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 283
|
House
|
11/26/2012
|
Filed
|
|
|