By: Hilderbran, Villalba, Workman, Lozano, H.B. No. 213 Capriglione, et al. A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the $1 million total revenue exemption for the franchise tax. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 1(c), Chapter 286 (H.B. 4765), Acts of the 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, as amended by Section 37.01, Chapter 4 (S.B. 1), Acts of the 82nd Legislature, 1st Called Session, 2011, is repealed. SECTION 2. Section 2, Chapter 286 (H.B. 4765), Acts of the 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, as amended by Section 37.02, Chapter 4 (S.B. 1), Acts of the 82nd Legislature, 1st Called Session, 2011, and which amended former Subsection (d), Section 171.002, Tax Code, is repealed. SECTION 3. Section 3, Chapter 286 (H.B. 4765), Acts of the 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, as amended by Section 37.03, Chapter 4 (S.B. 1), Acts of the 82nd Legislature, 1st Called Session, 2011, and which amended former Subsection (a), Section 171.0021, Tax Code, is repealed. SECTION 4. (a) Effective January 1, 2016, Section 171.002(d), Tax Code, as amended by Section 1(a), Chapter 286 (H.B. 4765), Acts of the 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, is amended to read as follows: (d) A taxable entity is not required to pay any tax and is not considered to owe any tax for a period if: (1) the amount of tax computed for the taxable entity is less than $1,000; or (2) the amount of the taxable entity's total revenue from its entire business is less than or equal to $5 [$1] million or the amount determined under Section 171.006 per 12-month period on which margin is based. (b) Effective January 1, 2018, Section 171.002(d), Tax Code, as amended by Section 1(a), Chapter 286 (H.B. 4765), Acts of the 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, is amended to read as follows: (d) A taxable entity is not required to pay any tax and is not considered to owe any tax for a period if: (1) the amount of tax computed for the taxable entity is less than $1,000; or (2) the amount of the taxable entity's total revenue from its entire business is less than or equal to $10 [$1] million or the amount determined under Section 171.006 per 12-month period on which margin is based. (c) Effective January 1, 2020, Section 171.002(d), Tax Code, as amended by Section 1(a), Chapter 286 (H.B. 4765), Acts of the 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, is amended to read as follows: (d) A taxable entity is not required to pay any tax and is not considered to owe any tax for a period if: (1) the amount of tax computed for the taxable entity is less than $1,000; or (2) the amount of the taxable entity's total revenue from its entire business is less than or equal to $15 [$1] million or the amount determined under Section 171.006 per 12-month period on which margin is based. (d) Effective January 1, 2022, Section 171.002(d), Tax Code, as amended by Section 1(a), Chapter 286 (H.B. 4765), Acts of the 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, is amended to read as follows: (d) A taxable entity is not required to pay any tax and is not considered to owe any tax for a period if: (1) the amount of tax computed for the taxable entity is less than $1,000; or (2) the amount of the taxable entity's total revenue from its entire business is less than or equal to $20 [$1] million or the amount determined under Section 171.006 per 12-month period on which margin is based. (e) This section applies only to a report originally due on or after January 1, 2016. SECTION 5. Section 171.006(b), Tax Code, is amended to read as follows: (b) Beginning in 2010, on January 1 of each even-numbered year, the amounts prescribed by Sections 171.002(d)(2)[, 171.0021,] and 171.1013(c) are increased or decreased by an amount equal to the amount prescribed by those sections on December 31 of the preceding year multiplied by the percentage increase or decrease during the preceding state fiscal biennium in the consumer price index and rounded to the nearest $10,000. SECTION 6. Sections 171.0021 and 171.1016(d), Tax Code, are repealed. SECTION 7. Except as otherwise provided by this Act, this Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2013.