Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2133 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Larson, Villalba (Senate Sponsor - Uresti) H.B. No. 2133
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2013;
 May 10, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources; May 22, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0;
 May 22, 2013, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2133 By:  Uresti


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the public policy for the use of innovative and
 alternative water treatment technologies for water development
 purposes and to the establishment of the Texas Center for
 Innovative Desalination Technology.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1.003, Water Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 1.003.  PUBLIC POLICY.  It is the public policy of the
 state to provide for the conservation and development of the
 state's natural resources, including:
 (1)  the control, storage, preservation, and
 distribution of the state's storm and floodwaters and the waters of
 its rivers and streams for irrigation, power, and other useful
 purposes;
 (2)  the reclamation and irrigation of the state's
 arid, semiarid, and other land needing irrigation;
 (3)  the reclamation and drainage of the state's
 overflowed land and other land needing drainage;
 (4)  the conservation and development of its forest,
 water, and hydroelectric power;
 (5)  the navigation of the state's inland and coastal
 waters;
 (6)  the maintenance of a proper ecological environment
 of the bays and estuaries of Texas and the health of related living
 marine resources;
 (7)  the voluntary stewardship of public and private
 lands to benefit waters of the state; [and]
 (8)  the promotion of rainwater harvesting for potable
 and nonpotable purposes at public and private facilities in this
 state, including residential, commercial, and industrial
 buildings;
 (9)  the facilitation of the efficient and effective
 use of innovative and alternative water treatment technologies
 whenever possible to meet the natural resource needs of this state;
 and
 (10)  the promotion of direct reuse of reclaimed water
 for nonpotable purposes whenever possible to enhance and preserve
 the state's freshwater supply.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 111, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter J to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER J.  TEXAS CENTER FOR INNOVATIVE
 DESALINATION TECHNOLOGY
 Sec. 111.131.  DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter:
 (1)  "Boards" means the board of regents of the
 University of Houston System and the board of regents of The
 University of Texas System.
 (2)  "Center" means the Texas Center for Innovative
 Desalination Technology established under this subchapter.
 Sec. 111.132.  ESTABLISHMENT. (a) The Texas Center for
 Innovative Desalination Technology is established as a partnership
 between the University of Houston, The University of Texas at
 Brownsville, and The University of Texas at El Paso.
 (b)  The organization, control, and management of the center
 are vested in the boards, and the respective institutions shall
 execute a memorandum of understanding for that purpose.
 (c)  The center shall be hosted by the University of
 Houston's Cullen College of Engineering, The University of Texas at
 Brownsville's College of Science, Mathematics, and Technology, and
 The University of Texas at El Paso's Center for Inland Desalination
 Systems. Participation in the center's activities shall be open to
 any faculty or staff member of each host university who is an active
 researcher in the field of water desalination, engineering,
 hydrology, biology, water supply development, or energy
 efficiency, or in another relevant field as determined by the
 boards.
 Sec. 111.133.  PURPOSE. The center is created to:
 (1)  promote interdisciplinary research, education,
 and training for the development of state-of-the-art products,
 materials, systems, and technologies designed for the desalination
 of seawater from the Gulf of Mexico and brackish water within
 surface and groundwater resources throughout the state; and
 (2)  develop cost-effective, energy-efficient, and
 environmentally sound water desalination, brine disposal, and
 water conveyance technologies that can enhance the potential for
 desalinated water to contribute toward the state's long-term water
 portfolio.
 Sec. 111.134.  POWERS AND DUTIES. The center shall:
 (1)  collaborate with appropriate international,
 federal, state, and local agencies and private business or
 nonprofit entities as necessary to develop innovative desalination
 technologies;
 (2)  research and develop innovative seawater and
 brackish water desalination technologies, including pretreatment
 technologies and improvements, that are energy efficient and cost
 effective, minimize environmental impacts, and offer long-term
 water supply solutions for the state;
 (3)  research and develop brine disposal and reuse
 methods and technologies;
 (4)  research and develop water conveyance systems and
 technologies that may be used to transport desalinated water to
 target use populations;
 (5)  develop test facilities for evaluating the
 performance of new products, materials, or techniques;
 (6)  develop specifications and standards for products
 used for desalinating water, conveying water, and disposing of
 brine;
 (7)  provide public information, education, and
 outreach regarding desalination technologies and appropriate uses
 and conservation methods for desalinated water; and
 (8)  provide data, recommendations, and any other
 information necessary relating to desalination for local,
 regional, or statewide water planning programs and processes.
 Sec. 111.135.  COLLABORATION WITH OTHER ENTITIES. The
 University of Houston, The University of Texas at Brownsville, and
 The University of Texas at El Paso shall encourage public and
 private entities to participate in or support the operation of the
 center and may enter into an agreement with any public or private
 entity for that purpose. An agreement may allow the center to
 provide information, services, or other assistance to an entity in
 exchange for the entity's participation or support.
 Sec. 111.136.  GIFTS AND GRANTS. The boards may solicit,
 accept, and administer gifts and grants from any public or private
 source for the purposes of the center.
 Sec. 111.137.  PERSONNEL. The boards may employ personnel
 for the center as necessary.
 Sec. 111.138.  EXPIRATION. This subchapter expires
 September 1, 2023.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *