E
|
06/14/2013
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5443
|
E
|
05/26/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5439
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3756
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4870
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4878
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2848
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4252
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#1110
|
Journal Page: 4252
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4252
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3899
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2064
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2064
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2064
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2064
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2064
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2064
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Ellis
|
Journal Page: 2063
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2063
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2062
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2062
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2034
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1902
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 1724
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1724
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1714
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3091
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2870
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#708
|
Journal Page: 2869
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2869
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Amended
|
1-Dutton
|
Journal Page: 2869
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2869
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2792
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2792
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Amended
|
1-Dutton
|
Journal Page: 2791
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2791
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1456
|
House
|
03/27/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2013
|
Recommendations filed with the Speaker
|
|
Journal Page: 1173
|
House
|
03/13/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2013
|
Referred to Urban Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 655
|
House
|
03/07/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 655
|
House
|
03/04/2013
|
Transmitted to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|