E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5442
|
E
|
05/22/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4555
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2482
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4062
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4076
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3900
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2126
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2126
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2126
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2126
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2126
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2126
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2126
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2034
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1902
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 1801
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1801
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1799
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3371
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3209
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#815
|
Journal Page: 3208
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3208
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3208
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3198
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3198
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2277
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1619
|
House
|
03/26/2013
|
Recommendations filed with the Speaker
|
|
Journal Page: 1173
|
House
|
03/07/2013
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 655
|
House
|
03/07/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 655
|
House
|
03/04/2013
|
Transmitted to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|