House | 05/02/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2277 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/25/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/25/2013 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 02/07/2013 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 283 | |
House | 02/07/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 283 | |
House | 11/26/2012 | Filed |