E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective on 9/1/13
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5442
|
E
|
05/27/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5440
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3861
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5434
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5439
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5386
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3755
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3755
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3759
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4931
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4930
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3571
|
House
|
05/25/2013
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4872
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4872
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3050
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 3050
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2925
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2925
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2925
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4303
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4303
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 4303
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3899
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2046
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2046
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2046
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2046
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2046
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2045
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2045
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Lucio
|
Journal Page: 2044
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2044
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2044
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2034
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 1668
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1668
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1442
|
House
|
05/05/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2551
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2395
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#530
|
Journal Page: 2395
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2395
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2395
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2349
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2349
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1562
|
House
|
04/03/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2013
|
Referred to Urban Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 708
|
House
|
03/12/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 708
|
House
|
03/01/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|