Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2152 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Callegari (Senate Sponsor - Lucio) H.B. No. 2152
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2013;
 May 8, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources; May 17, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 17, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to fees charged to certain recreational vehicle parks.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 13.087, Water Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (b-1) to read as
 follows:
 (b)  A municipally owned utility that provides nonsubmetered
 master metered utility service to a recreational vehicle park shall
 determine the rates for that service on the same basis the utility
 uses to determine the rates for other commercial businesses[,
 including hotels and motels,] that serve transient customers and
 receive nonsubmetered master metered utility service from the
 utility.
 (b-1)  A municipally owned utility that provides
 nonsubmetered master metered utility service to a recreational
 vehicle park may not charge a recreational vehicle park a fee that
 the utility does not charge other commercial businesses that serve
 transient customers and receive nonsubmetered master metered
 utility service from the utility.
 SECTION 2.  Section 49.351, Water Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (m) to read as follows:
 (m)  Notwithstanding any other provision of this section, a
 district may not charge a fee to a recreational vehicle park, as
 defined by Section 13.087, on the basis of connections the park
 provides for the park's transient customers. A fee charged to a
 recreational vehicle park must be based on the park's nonsubmetered
 master meter connection.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *