Senate | 05/10/2013 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 1724 | |
Senate | 05/10/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1724 | |
Senate | 05/10/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1714 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3091 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2879 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Record vote | RV#717 | Journal Page: 2879 |
House | 05/09/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2879 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2878 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2797 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Amendment tabled | 1-Canales | Journal Page: 2797 |
House | 05/08/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2797 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2163 | |
House | 04/23/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/07/2013 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 657 | |
House | 03/07/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 657 | |
House | 03/01/2013 | Filed |