House
|
05/06/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2550
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Recommitted to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2088
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2163
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2013
|
Referred to Energy Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 657
|
House
|
03/07/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 657
|
House
|
03/01/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|