E
|
06/14/2013
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5443
|
E
|
05/23/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4878
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2809
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4158
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4294
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4069
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2271
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2271
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2271
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2271
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2270
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2270
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2270
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2560
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2035
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1723
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1723
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1717
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3194
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3049
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#767
|
Journal Page: 3048
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3048
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3048
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2938
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2938
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Amended
|
1-Springer
|
Journal Page: 2937
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2937
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2076
|
House
|
04/19/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2013
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 283
|
House
|
02/07/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 283
|
House
|
11/26/2012
|
Filed
|
|
|