E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective on 9/1/13
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5442
|
E
|
05/26/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5439
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3756
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4870
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4914
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2925
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4303
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4306
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#1132
|
Journal Page: 4306
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4303
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4303
|
House
|
05/18/2013
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2013
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3670
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1936
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1936
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1936
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1936
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1936
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1936
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1936
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1869
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1294
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1294
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1217
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1914
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1798
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#287
|
Journal Page: 1797
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1797
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Amended
|
10-Cook
|
Journal Page: 1797
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
9-Hunter, Smithee, R. Sheffield, and Lozano
|
Journal Page: 1796
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Amendment tabled
|
7-Sheets
|
Journal Page: 1794
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
5-Hilderbran
|
Journal Page: 1790
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1788
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1770
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1770
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#283
|
Journal Page: 1769
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1769
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 1768
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
1 hr. notice-for reconsideration
|
|
Journal Page: 1764
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Failed to pass to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1762
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Amended
|
6-Herrero and Martinez Fischer
|
Journal Page: 1761
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Amendment as amended fails of adoption
|
4-Walle
|
Journal Page: 1760
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1760
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Amendment amended
|
5-Walle
|
Journal Page: 1760
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
4-Walle
|
Journal Page: 1759
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
2-Walle
|
Journal Page: 1759
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
1-Herrero and Martinez Fischer
|
Journal Page: 1758
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 1758
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Postponed
|
4/23/13 11:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 1751
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1751
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1544
|
House
|
04/09/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
|
|
Journal Page: 671
|
House
|
03/11/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 671
|
House
|
03/04/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|