House
|
05/09/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2076
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 673
|
House
|
03/11/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 673
|
House
|
03/04/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|