Senate | 05/10/2013 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 1724 | |
Senate | 05/10/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1724 | |
Senate | 05/10/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1714 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3091 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2865 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Record vote | RV#702 | Journal Page: 2864 |
House | 05/09/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2864 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2864 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2789 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2789 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Amended | 2-Kleinschmidt | Journal Page: 2789 |
House | 05/08/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2789 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/05/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/05/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/04/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1456 | |
House | 04/02/2013 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Meeting cancelled | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/11/2013 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 674 | |
House | 03/11/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 674 | |
House | 03/04/2013 | Filed |