E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective on 9/1/13
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5442
|
E
|
05/20/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4076
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2025
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3589
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1924
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3911
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3509
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3509
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#896
|
Journal Page: 3509
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3509
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3369
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1840
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1840
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1840
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1840
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1840
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1840
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1840
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1765
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Referred to Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 1294
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1294
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1268
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2028
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1919
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#336
|
Journal Page: 1918
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1918
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1918
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1886
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Amended
|
1-S. Turner
|
Journal Page: 1885
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1885
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1629
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 679
|
House
|
03/11/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 679
|
House
|
03/04/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|