House | 04/17/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1572 | |
House | 03/26/2013 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | Journal Page: 1173 | |
House | 03/11/2013 | Referred to Special Purpose Districts | Journal Page: 679 | |
House | 03/11/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 679 | |
House | 03/05/2013 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
House | 03/04/2013 | Filed |