E
|
05/25/2013
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/25/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5391
|
E
|
05/14/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3371
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1800
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3205
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3371
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3192
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Remarks ordered printed
|
|
Journal Page: 1739
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1739
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1739
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1739
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1738
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1738
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1738
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1738
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1673
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Referred to Administration
|
|
Journal Page: 1294
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1294
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1268
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2076
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1972
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#365
|
Journal Page: 1971
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1971
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1971
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1964
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1964
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1964
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Amendment tabled
|
1-Hughes
|
Journal Page: 1958
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1956
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1774
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Agriculture & Livestock
|
|
Journal Page: 679
|
House
|
03/11/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 679
|
House
|
03/04/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|