Senate | 05/07/2013 | Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair | ||
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 1294 | |
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1294 | |
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1088 | |
House | 04/19/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1735 | |
House | 04/19/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1689 | |
House | 04/19/2013 | Record vote | RV#248 | Journal Page: 1688 |
House | 04/19/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1688 | |
House | 04/19/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1688 | |
House | 04/18/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1673 | |
House | 04/18/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1673 | |
House | 04/18/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1224 | |
House | 03/28/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/28/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/21/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/21/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/21/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/21/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/21/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/11/2013 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | Journal Page: 685 | |
House | 03/11/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 685 | |
House | 03/05/2013 | Filed |