Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2407 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Naishtat (Senate Sponsor - Huffman) H.B. No. 2407
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2013;
 May 6, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 17, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 17, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to restoration of a person's right to purchase a firearm on
 termination of a guardianship.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 1202, Estates Code, as effective January
 1, 2014, is amended by adding Subchapter E to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER E. RESTORATION OF RIGHTS ON TERMINATION OF GUARDIANSHIP
 Sec. 1202.201.  REMOVAL OF FIREARM DISABILITY ON COMPLETE
 RESTORATION OF WARD'S CAPACITY. (a) A person whose guardianship
 was terminated because the person's capacity was completely
 restored may file an application with the court that created the
 guardianship for an order requesting the removal of the person's
 disability to purchase a firearm imposed under 18 U.S.C. Section
 922(g)(4).
 (b)  At a proceeding involving the complete restoration of
 the ward's capacity under Subchapter B, the ward or a person
 interested in the ward's welfare may request an order seeking
 relief from a firearms disability described by Subsection (a).
 (c)  In determining whether to grant the relief sought under
 Subsection (a) or (b), the court must hear and consider evidence
 about:
 (1)  the circumstances that led to imposition of the
 firearms disability;
 (2)  the person's mental history;
 (3)  the person's criminal history; and
 (4)  the person's reputation.
 (d)  A court may not grant relief under this section unless
 the court makes and enters in the record the following affirmative
 findings:
 (1)  the person or ward is no longer likely to act in a
 manner dangerous to public safety; and
 (2)  removing the person's or ward's disability to
 purchase a firearm is in the public interest.
 SECTION 2.  Section 1202.151(a), Estates Code, as effective
 January 1, 2014, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  Except as provided by Section 1202.201, at [At] a
 hearing on an application filed under Section 1202.051, the court
 shall consider only evidence regarding the ward's mental or
 physical capacity at the time of the hearing that is relevant to the
 complete restoration of the ward's capacity or modification of the
 ward's guardianship.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2014.
 * * * * *