E | 06/14/2013 | Effective on 1/1/14 | ||
E | 06/14/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5441 | |
E | 05/20/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4076 | |
Senate | 05/20/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2155 | |
House | 05/20/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3691 | |
House | 05/17/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3910 | |
House | 05/17/2013 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3589 | |
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1910 | |
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1910 | |
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1910 | |
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1910 | |
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1910 | |
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1910 | |
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1910 | |
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/10/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/10/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/10/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1728 | |
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 777 | |
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 777 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 704 | |
House | 04/03/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1428 | |
House | 04/03/2013 | Record vote | RV#138 | Journal Page: 1217 |
House | 04/03/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1217 | |
House | 04/03/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1217 | |
House | 04/03/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1210 | |
House | 04/03/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1210 | |
House | 04/03/2013 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 03/24/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/22/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1005 | |
House | 03/18/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/11/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/11/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/11/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/11/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/07/2013 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 285 | |
House | 02/07/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 285 | |
House | 12/04/2012 | Filed |