Senate | 05/16/2013 | No action taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/16/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1862 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1385 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1385 | |
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1338 | |
House | 04/30/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2164 | |
House | 04/30/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2048 | |
House | 04/30/2013 | Record vote | RV#390 | Journal Page: 2047 |
House | 04/30/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2047 | |
House | 04/30/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2047 | |
House | 04/29/2013 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2020 | |
House | 04/29/2013 | Amended | 2-Martinez Fischer and Parker | Journal Page: 2020 |
House | 04/29/2013 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2020 | |
House | 04/29/2013 | Postponed | Journal Page: 1989 | |
House | 04/26/2013 | Postponed | 4/29/13 12:00 PM | Journal Page: 1954 |
House | 04/26/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1954 | |
House | 04/26/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/19/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/05/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/04/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/04/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1456 | |
House | 04/01/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/01/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/13/2013 | Referred to Government Efficiency & Reform | Journal Page: 727 | |
House | 03/13/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 727 | |
House | 03/05/2013 | Filed |