Senate | 05/03/2013 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1430 | |
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1430 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1383 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2277 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2108 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Record vote | RV#422 | Journal Page: 2107 |
House | 05/01/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2107 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2107 | |
House | 04/30/2013 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2067 | |
House | 04/30/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2067 | |
House | 04/30/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2067 | |
House | 04/30/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1224 | |
House | 03/27/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/20/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/20/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/20/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/20/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/13/2013 | Referred to Corrections | Journal Page: 727 | |
House | 03/13/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 727 | |
House | 03/05/2013 | Filed |