E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5442
|
E
|
05/25/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5391
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3515
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4535
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4555
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4290
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2726
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2726
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2726
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2726
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2726
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2726
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2725
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1869
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 1710
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1710
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1589
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2844
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2566
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#587
|
Journal Page: 2565
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2565
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2565
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2507
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2507
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Amended
|
1-Wu
|
Journal Page: 2506
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2506
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1698
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2013
|
Referred to Energy Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 728
|
House
|
03/13/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 728
|
House
|
03/05/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|