Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2459 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Thompson of Harris, et al. H.B. No. 2459
 (Senate Sponsor - Carona)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2013;
 April 30, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Business and Commerce; May 7, 2013, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 7, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the limitation on the amount that may be charged for
 certain debt cancellation agreements.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 348.601(b), Finance Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (b)  The amount charged for a debt cancellation agreement
 made in connection with a retail installment contract may not
 exceed five percent of the amount financed pursuant to the retail
 installment contract [must be created in good faith and be
 commercially reasonable]. Section 348.124(c) does not apply to a
 debt cancellation agreement regulated under this subchapter.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *