Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2460 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Thompson of Harris (Senate Sponsor - Carona) H.B. No. 2460
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2013;
 May 2, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Business
 and Commerce; May 16, 2013, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 16, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the possession of stamps indicating the payment of
 taxes by certain permittees.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 28, Alcoholic Beverage Code, is amended
 by adding Section 28.151 to read as follows:
 Sec. 28.151.  POSSESSION OF CERTAIN STAMPS. A mixed
 beverage permittee may not possess a stamp used to show payment of a
 tax unless the stamp is affixed to a bottle or container of liquor.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 32, Alcoholic Beverage Code, is amended
 by adding Section 32.201 to read as follows:
 Sec. 32.201.  POSSESSION OF CERTAIN STAMPS. A private club
 registration permittee may not possess a stamp used to show payment
 of a tax unless the stamp is affixed to a bottle or container of
 liquor.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *