Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2465 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Farias (Senate Sponsor - Ellis) H.B. No. 2465
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 22, 2013;
 April 24, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 10, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 10, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the secretary of state providing information to voters
 regarding their voting status through an Internet website.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter D, Chapter 15, Election Code, is
 amended by adding Section 15.086 to read as follows:
 Sec. 15.086.  INTERNET ACCESS TO SUSPENSE INFORMATION. Any
 Internet website maintained by the secretary of state that permits
 a person to determine the person's voter registration status shall,
 to the extent practicable, indicate if the person is or may be on
 the suspense list.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *