E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective on 9/1/13
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5441
|
E
|
05/20/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4076
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2025
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3589
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1924
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3910
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3500
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3501
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#891
|
Journal Page: 3501
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3500
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3363
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1811
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1811
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1811
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1811
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1811
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1811
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1811
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1762
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1727
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 1007
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1007
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 889
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1544
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1519
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#200
|
Journal Page: 1519
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1519
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1519
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1504
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1504
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 693
|
House
|
03/05/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2013
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 286
|
House
|
02/07/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 286
|
House
|
12/04/2012
|
Filed
|
|
|