Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB250 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Miller of Comal (Senate Sponsor - Estes) H.B. No. 250
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 22, 2013;
 April 24, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 9, 2013, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 9, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of a segment of Interstate Highway 35 as
 the Trooper Randy Vetter Memorial Highway.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 225.091 to read as follows:
 Sec. 225.091.  TROOPER RANDY VETTER MEMORIAL HIGHWAY. (a)
 The portion of Interstate Highway 35 between River Ridge Parkway
 and Farm-to-Market Road 150 in Hays County is designated as the
 Trooper Randy Vetter Memorial Highway. The designation is in
 addition to any other designation.
 (b)  Subject to Section 225.021(c), the department shall:
 (1)  design and construct markers indicating the
 designation as the Trooper Randy Vetter Memorial Highway and any
 other appropriate information; and
 (2)  erect a marker at each end of the highway and at
 appropriate intermediate sites along the highway.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *