Senate | 05/07/2013 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1573 | |
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1573 | |
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1444 | |
House | 05/03/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2465 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Record vote | RV#443 | Journal Page: 2214 |
House | 05/02/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2214 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2214 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2119 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2119 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/25/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/19/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1698 | |
House | 04/15/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 713 | |
House | 03/12/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 713 | |
House | 03/05/2013 | Filed |