E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective on 9/1/13
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5442
|
E
|
05/27/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5440
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3814
|
House
|
05/25/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4914
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4914
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3033
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4367
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4369
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4368
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#1152
|
Journal Page: 4368
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4367
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4064
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2281
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2280
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2280
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2280
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2280
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2280
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2280
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2280
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2257
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 1710
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1710
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1589
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2844
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2582
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#602
|
Journal Page: 2581
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2581
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2581
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2520
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2520
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2520
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2075
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2013
|
Referred to Energy Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 742
|
House
|
03/14/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 742
|
House
|
03/06/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|