Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2536 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Geren, Capriglione (Senate Sponsor - Nelson) H.B. No. 2536
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2013;
 April 30, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 9, 2013, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 9, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the composition of certain regional transportation
 authority subregional boards.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 452.541, Transportation Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 452.541.  BOARD MEMBERSHIP: RESIDENCY IN AUTHORITY.
 (a) Except as provided by Subsection (b), a [A] member of a
 subregional board must be a qualified voter residing in the
 authority.
 (b)  An individual who does not reside in the authority may
 be appointed to the board under Section 452.562(c)(1) if the
 individual is a qualified voter of and resides in a municipality
 that:
 (1)  has entered into a contract with the authority to
 receive services; and
 (2)  has adopted a sales tax to participate in the
 funding of a transportation project being planned, developed, or
 operated by the authority.
 SECTION 2.  Section 452.562, Transportation Code, is amended
 by amending Subsection (c) and adding Subsection (g) to read as
 follows:
 (c)  If Subsection (b) does not apply, the subregional board
 shall be appointed as follows:
 (1)  the commissioners court of the county of the
 principal municipality shall appoint at least one member to
 represent:
 (A)  the unincorporated areas and municipalities
 in the county that are not otherwise represented on the subregional
 board; and
 (B)  the municipalities that have entered into a
 contract with the authority to receive services; and
 (2)  the remaining members shall be apportioned to the
 municipalities confirmed as all or part of the subregion according
 to the ratio that the population of each unit of election bears to
 the total population of the area confirmed as the subregion.
 (g)  An elected officer of the state or a political
 subdivision of this state who is not prohibited by the Texas
 Constitution from serving on the board is eligible, as an
 additional duty of office, to serve on the board. An elected
 officer who is a board member is not entitled to receive
 compensation for serving as a member but is entitled to
 reimbursement for reasonable expenses incurred in performing
 duties as a member.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *