1 | 1 | | By: Geren (Senate Sponsor - Carona) H.B. No. 2537 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2013; |
---|
3 | 3 | | May 7, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Business |
---|
4 | 4 | | and Commerce; May 16, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
5 | 5 | | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 1; |
---|
6 | 6 | | May 16, 2013, sent to printer.) |
---|
7 | 7 | | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2537 By: Carona |
---|
8 | 8 | | |
---|
9 | 9 | | |
---|
10 | 10 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
11 | 11 | | AN ACT |
---|
12 | 12 | | relating to production requirements for holders of winery permits. |
---|
13 | 13 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
14 | 14 | | SECTION 1. Chapter 16, Alcoholic Beverage Code, is amended |
---|
15 | 15 | | by adding Section 16.012 to read as follows: |
---|
16 | 16 | | Sec. 16.012. PRODUCTION REQUIREMENTS. (a) This section |
---|
17 | 17 | | does not apply to a holder of a winery permit described by Section |
---|
18 | 18 | | 16.09(i). |
---|
19 | 19 | | (b) The holder of a winery permit must produce or bottle and |
---|
20 | 20 | | offer for sale at least 200 gallons of wine or fruit brandy annually |
---|
21 | 21 | | beginning in the 12-month period preceding the first anniversary of |
---|
22 | 22 | | the date the winery's original permit is issued. |
---|
23 | 23 | | (b-1) Notwithstanding Subsection (b), the holder of a |
---|
24 | 24 | | winery permit issued before September 1, 2014, must produce or |
---|
25 | 25 | | bottle and offer for sale at least 200 gallons of wine or fruit |
---|
26 | 26 | | brandy annually beginning in the 12-month period preceding |
---|
27 | 27 | | September 1, 2015. This subsection expires September 1, 2016. |
---|
28 | 28 | | (c) The production required by this section must be done at |
---|
29 | 29 | | the permitted location or at a Texas winery owned and operated by |
---|
30 | 30 | | the same permit holder. |
---|
31 | 31 | | (d) Failure to comply with this section constitutes grounds |
---|
32 | 32 | | to cancel or suspend a winery permit or deny an application for |
---|
33 | 33 | | renewal of a winery permit. |
---|
34 | 34 | | SECTION 2. Section 16.09, Alcoholic Beverage Code, is |
---|
35 | 35 | | amended by adding Subsections (f), (g), (h), and (i) to read as |
---|
36 | 36 | | follows: |
---|
37 | 37 | | (f) At least 51 percent by volume of the wine shipped under |
---|
38 | 38 | | this section must be produced or bottled in this state: |
---|
39 | 39 | | (1) by the holder of a winery permit on the winery's |
---|
40 | 40 | | premises or at another permitted location owned and operated by the |
---|
41 | 41 | | permit holder; |
---|
42 | 42 | | (2) under an operating agreement authorized by Section |
---|
43 | 43 | | 16.05; or |
---|
44 | 44 | | (3) under an agreement with another winery permit |
---|
45 | 45 | | holder for a bottling brand under an Alcohol and Tobacco Tax and |
---|
46 | 46 | | Trade Bureau Basic Permit trade name application. |
---|
47 | 47 | | (g) The holder of a winery permit shall maintain complete |
---|
48 | 48 | | records of each sale and delivery made under this section for at |
---|
49 | 49 | | least five years from the date of the sale. The records shall be |
---|
50 | 50 | | made available on request for inspection by the commission or any |
---|
51 | 51 | | other appropriate state agency. |
---|
52 | 52 | | (h) The commission shall adopt rules requiring the holder of |
---|
53 | 53 | | a winery permit to periodically file reports providing the |
---|
54 | 54 | | commission with any information the commission determines is |
---|
55 | 55 | | necessary to more efficiently and effectively enforce this section. |
---|
56 | 56 | | At a minimum, the reports must specify: |
---|
57 | 57 | | (1) whether wine sold and delivered by the permit |
---|
58 | 58 | | holder under this section was produced or bottled in this state; and |
---|
59 | 59 | | (2) whether the wine was: |
---|
60 | 60 | | (A) produced or bottled: |
---|
61 | 61 | | (i) by the holder of the winery permit on |
---|
62 | 62 | | the winery's premises or at another permitted location owned and |
---|
63 | 63 | | operated by the permit holder; |
---|
64 | 64 | | (ii) under an operating agreement |
---|
65 | 65 | | authorized by Section 16.05; or |
---|
66 | 66 | | (iii) under an agreement with another |
---|
67 | 67 | | winery permit holder for a bottling brand under an Alcohol and |
---|
68 | 68 | | Tobacco Tax and Trade Bureau Basic Permit trade name application; |
---|
69 | 69 | | or |
---|
70 | 70 | | (B) purchased from an authorized source. |
---|
71 | 71 | | (i) Subsection (f) does not apply to the holder of a winery |
---|
72 | 72 | | permit issued on or before June 1, 2012, if at least 95 percent by |
---|
73 | 73 | | volume of the wine shipped under that permit during 2012 had a |
---|
74 | 74 | | personalized label that: |
---|
75 | 75 | | (1) contained a personal message, picture, or other |
---|
76 | 76 | | artwork that was specific to the consumer who purchased the |
---|
77 | 77 | | product; and |
---|
78 | 78 | | (2) was designed by the consumer and affixed by the |
---|
79 | 79 | | permit holder at the licensed premises. |
---|
80 | 80 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2014. |
---|
81 | 81 | | * * * * * |
---|