Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2562 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Farias (Senate Sponsor - Van de Putte) H.B. No. 2562
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2013;
 May 7, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran
 Affairs and Military Installations; May 17, 2013, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0; May 17, 2013,
 sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an annual report on the Public Assistance Reporting
 Information System.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 531.0998(e), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (e)  Not later than October 1 of each year [, 2012], the
 commission, the Texas Veterans Commission, the Veterans' Land
 Board, and the Department of Aging and Disability Services
 collectively shall submit to the legislature, the governor, and the
 Legislative Budget Board a report describing:
 (1)  interagency progress in identifying [the
 frequency] and obtaining Department of Veterans Affairs benefits
 for veterans receiving Medicaid and other public benefit programs
 [success with which state agencies have used the system];
 (2)  the number of veterans benefits claims awarded,
 the total dollar amount of veterans benefits claims awarded, and
 the costs to the state that were avoided as a result of state
 agencies' use of the system; [and]
 (3)  efforts to expand the use of the system and improve
 the effectiveness of shifting veterans from Medicaid and other
 public benefits to Department of Veterans Affairs benefits,
 including any barriers and how state agencies have addressed those
 barriers; and
 (4)  the extent to which the Texas Veterans Commission
 has targeted specific populations of veterans, including
 populations in rural counties and in specific age and
 service-connected disability categories, in order to maximize
 benefits for veterans and savings to the state [recommendations for
 future use of the system by state agencies].
 SECTION 2.  Section 531.0998(f), Government Code, is
 repealed.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *