House | 04/29/2013 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 1992 | |
House | 04/29/2013 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 120 | Journal Page: 1991 |
House | 04/29/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1225 | |
House | 03/27/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/13/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/13/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/13/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/13/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/13/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/07/2013 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 287 | |
House | 02/07/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 287 | |
House | 12/06/2012 | Filed |