Senate | 05/16/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/16/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/16/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/16/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1862 | |
Senate | 05/13/2013 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1760 | |
Senate | 05/13/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1760 | |
Senate | 05/10/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1715 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3091 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2876 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Record vote | RV#714 | Journal Page: 2875 |
House | 05/09/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2875 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2875 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2796 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2796 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Amended | 1-Klick | Journal Page: 2795 |
House | 05/08/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2795 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2075 | |
House | 04/22/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/01/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/01/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 762 | |
House | 03/18/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 762 | |
House | 03/06/2013 | Filed |