Senate | 05/10/2013 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 1724 | |
Senate | 05/10/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1724 | |
Senate | 05/10/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1719 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3194 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Record vote | RV#770 | Journal Page: 3052 |
House | 05/10/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 3052 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3052 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2978 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Amended | 1-Callegari | Journal Page: 2973 |
House | 05/09/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2973 | |
House | 05/07/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/04/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/03/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/03/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/02/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2365 | |
House | 04/26/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/26/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/26/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 762 | |
House | 03/18/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 762 | |
House | 03/06/2013 | Filed |